Winnett v. Bray et al

Plaintiff: Donald F Winnett
Defendant: Bray, Lay and Warner
Case Number: 2:2016cv00013
Filed: January 19, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2017 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 157 Partial Recommended Disposition in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; granting 134 motion for summary judgment filed by separate defendants Gaylon Lay, Mark Warner, Arlen Parham, and De an Yancey; and dismissing Mr. Winnett's claims against Mr. Lay, Mr. Warner, Mr. Parham, and Mr. Yancey without prejudice based on Mr. Winnett's failure to fully exhaust his administrative remedies against them. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/26/2017. (mef)
December 19, 2016 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 118 Partial Recommended Disposition in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects and finding that Mr. Winnett's 111 motion for permanent injunction is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/19/2016. (rhm)
December 2, 2016 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting the 115 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; and granting in part and denying in part the 68 motion to dismiss filed by separate defendants Dean Yancey and Arlen Parham. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/2/2016. (ljb)
September 13, 2016 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving and Adopting 76 77 Partial Recommended Dispositions in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; denying 47 motion for a preliminary injunction; and denying 58 motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 09/13/2016. (rhm)
September 12, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving and Adopting 31 Partial Recommended Disposition in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects and granting in part and denying in part defendants' 15 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 09/12/2016. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winnett v. Bray et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald F Winnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bray
Represented By: Bourgon Burnelle Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lay
Represented By: Bourgon Burnelle Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner
Represented By: Bourgon Burnelle Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?