Chambers v. Kelley et al
Plaintiff: Gary Chambers
Defendant: Wendy Kelley, Raymond Nailor, Gaylon Lay, David Mills, DeAngelo Earle, William Connor, Butler, Stieve, Drummond and L Dickerson
Case Number: 2:2016cv00121
Filed: September 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER denying 141 Motion. Chambers hasn't made the showing required to reopen the time for filing a notice of appeal and nothing in his new paper warrants relief from the Judgment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/18/2018. (jak)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER denying without prejudice 139 Motion. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/29/2018. (jak)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 JUDGMENT: The case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/16/2017. (jak)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER adopting 84 Partial Recommendation and overruling Chambers's 101 objections. ADC Defendants' 56 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. Chambers's claims against Kelley, Naylor, Lay, and Earle are dismissed without prejudic e for failure to exhaust. 102 Partial Recommendation is adopted. 89 Motion for summary judgment is granted. The claims against Mills are also dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/21/2017. (jak)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER adopting 50 Partial Recommendation. Chambers's 49 Motion for a temporary restraining order is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/22/2016. (jak)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER adopting 39 Partial Recommendation. 4 Motion for preliminary injunctive relief denied. 19 Motion to Dismiss granted in part and denied in part. Chambers's claims for damages against the ADC defendants in their official capacity are d ismissed with prejudice; his claim that Dickerson denied him access to the Courts is dismissed without prejudice; and the motion is denied without prejudice on exhaustion and failure to investigate. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/15/2016. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Nailor
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylon Lay
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeAngelo Earle
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Dickerson
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?