Watlington et al v. McCrory Arkansas, City of et al
Plaintiff: David Watlington and Lindsey Hollaway
Defendant: McCrory Arkansas, City of and Paul Hatch
Case Number: 2:2017cv00002
Filed: January 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Helena Office
County: Woodruff
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 JUDGMENT: The amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Defendants' counterclaim is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/30/2017. (jak)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 26 Motion. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/3/2017. (jak)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying without prejudice 16 Motion to Dismiss. Any amended complaint is due by 6/23/2017. If none is filed, the Court will, on its own, dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/23/2017. (kdr)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Defendant's 13 status report noted. The stay is lifted. The prompt amendment of the ordinance moots the request for injunctive relief; the 2 motion for a preliminary injunction is denied without prejudice. The Court extends the Defendants' time to answer or file a Rule 12(b) motion until 2/17/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/13/2017. (jak)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying without prejudice as moot 2 Watlington and Hollaway's motion for a TRO. The case isn't moot; but the request for stop-gap injunctive relief is. The 1/12/2017 hearing is cancelled and the case is stayed until 2/24/2017. Joint status report due by 2/15/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/11/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watlington et al v. McCrory Arkansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Watlington
Represented By: John D. Coulter
Represented By: Rebecca Ramaswamy
Represented By: Catherine Sevcenko
Represented By: Phil Telfeyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Hollaway
Represented By: John D. Coulter
Represented By: Rebecca Ramaswamy
Represented By: Catherine Sevcenko
Represented By: Phil Telfeyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCrory Arkansas, City of
Represented By: Jenna Adams
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Hatch
Represented By: Jenna Adams
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?