Labee v. Beasley
Plaintiff: John Labee
Defendant: Gene Beasley
Case Number: 2:2017cv00083
Filed: May 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: Joe J Volpe
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT: Consistent with the #10 Order that was entered on this day, this case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/1/2017. (mef)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER approving and adopting the #8 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition in their entirety and dismissing with prejudice the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. Nos. #1 , #2 ). Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/1/2017. (mef)
July 31, 2017 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #8 Proposed Findings and Recommendation by John Labee. (ljb)
July 20, 2017 Filing 8 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be dismissed with prejudice #1 #2 . Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/20/2017. (lej)
July 10, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (lej)
July 10, 2017 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Gene Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(McCord, Stacey)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk to serve a copy of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and this Order on the Respondent and the U.S. Attorney by regular mail #1 . The Court directs the Respondent to file an answer, motion, or other pleading responsive to the petition within 40 days after service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/30/2017. (lej)
May 30, 2017 Filing 4 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number LIT062060. (alm)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Petitioner to submit within 30 days from the entry date of this order either the $5 filing fee or a proper and complete Application with calculation sheet and certified copy of his trust fund account statement for the preceding six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/22/2017. (lej)
May 17, 2017 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by John Labee. (mef)
May 17, 2017 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by John Labee.(mef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labee v. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Beasley
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Labee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?