Nixon v. Rendon et al

Plaintiff: Jimmy Nixon
Defendant: A Rendon and Doe
Case Number: 2:2018cv00120
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Summons Issued as to A Rendon, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (cmn)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 motion for leave to proceed IFP; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of Forrest City Low - Federal Correctional Institution; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve Defendant Rendon with a copy of #1 Complaint, with any attachments, and a summons without prepayment of fees or costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/18/2018. (cmn)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmy Nixon. (ljb)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk to send Mr. Nixon a new IFP application, along with a copy of this Order; directing Mr. Nixon to complete the IFP application and return it to the Court within 30 days; and instructing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the FCI-FC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/20/2018. (cmn)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmy Nixon. (kdr)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk of Court to enclose an IFP application along with a copy of this Order; and directing the Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application or pay a $400 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/24/2018. (cmn)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jimmy Nixon. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nixon v. Rendon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?