Reese v. Correct Care Solutions LLC

Plaintiff: Renee A Reese
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00007
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Renee A Reese. Correct Care Solutions LLC served on 1/31/2019. (Valley, J.)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/29/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/13/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 2/24/2020 at 09:00 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 02/28/2019. (tmw)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 Motion to Dismiss filed by Correct Care Solutions LLC. (Madison, Eva)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Correct Care Solutions LLC (Madison, Eva)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eva C. Madison on behalf of Correct Care Solutions LLC (Madison, Eva)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Renee A Reese against Correct Care Solutions LLC. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT070500. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese v. Correct Care Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions LLC
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee A Reese
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?