Gavilon Grain LLC v. K & A Sealy Farms et al

Plaintiff: Gavilon Grain LLC
Defendant: Brocato & Unger Farms, C & A Heidelberger Farms, C & D Farms, Pharr Farms and K & A Sealy Farms
Case Number: 2:2019cv00058
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:4
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 8/19/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/3/2019. Proposed Bench Trial set sometime during the week of 6/15/2020 at 9:15 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gavilon Grain LLC. (Stone, Clayborne)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald E. Knapp, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Knapp, Donald)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Knapp, Donald)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Document)(Knapp, Donald)
June 7, 2019 Summons Issued and returned to attorney for plaintiff as to Brocato & Unger Farms, C & D Farms, K & A Sealy Farms, Pharr Farms. (jap)
June 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to C & A Heidelberger Farms and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 and #4 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Maryl C. Sattler and James G. Powers are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/6/2019. (ljb)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by JAMES G. POWERS. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3473309. Filed by Gavilon Grain LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stone, Clayborne)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by MARYL C. SATTLER. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3473292. Filed by Gavilon Grain LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stone, Clayborne)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration filed by Gavilon Grain LLC. (ljb)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION against All Defendants filed by Gavilon Grain LLC. No summons issued. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT072285.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gavilon Grain LLC v. K & A Sealy Farms et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brocato & Unger Farms
Represented By: Donald E. Knapp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & A Heidelberger Farms
Represented By: Donald E. Knapp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & D Farms
Represented By: Donald E. Knapp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharr Farms
Represented By: Donald E. Knapp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K & A Sealy Farms
Represented By: Donald E. Knapp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavilon Grain LLC
Represented By: Maryl C Sattler
Represented By: James G. Powers
Represented By: Clayborne S. Stone
Represented By: Maryl C. Sattler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?