Woodard v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Willie Woodard
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv00094
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie Woodard. Social Security Administration served on 9/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wallace, Stephanie)
August 16, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee: $400, receipt number LIT073450. (bmd)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must pay the applicable filing fee on or before 8/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 7/30/2019. (jbh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Willie Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Willie Woodard. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodard v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Woodard
Represented By: Stephanie Bartels Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?