Gardner v. Hendrix
Plaintiff: Kenneth Gardner
Defendant: Dewayne Hendrix
Case Number: 2:2019cv00098
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Motion to Dismiss by Dewayne Hendrix. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Smith, Shannon)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the clerk to serve a copy of #1 petition and this order on the respondent and the U.S. Attorney by regular mail. The respondent is directed to file an answer, motion or other response within 21 days after service of this petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/6/2019. (ljb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Kenneth Gardner. (llg)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee received: $5, receipt number LIT073702. (Original receipt mailed.) (llg)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Gardner to submit either the $5 filing fee, or a properly completed in forma pauperis application, no later than 30 days after the entry date of this order; and directing the Clerk to forward an in forma pauperis application to Gardner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/6/2019. (ljb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kenneth Gardner. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewayne Hendrix
Represented By: Shannon S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?