Boling v. Harcros Chemicals Inc et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Boling
Defendant: John Does, City of Elaine Water Works and Harcros Chemicals Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00157
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Time. Response due by 02/26/2020. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 02/03/2020. (rmg)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading by City of Elaine Water Works (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mann, William)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Boling. City of Elaine Water Works served on 1/16/2020. (Baker, Joseph)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Harcros Chemicals Inc (Barnes, Michael)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Harcros Chemicals Inc.(Barnes, Michael)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 motion to extend time. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/17/2020. (ejy)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Extend Time to File First Responsive Pleading or Motion by Harcros Chemicals Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email to Plaintiff's Counsel)(Barnes, Michael)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Barnes on behalf of Harcros Chemicals Inc (Barnes, Michael)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Boling. Harcros Chemicals Inc served on 12/30/2019. (Baker, Joseph)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Joshua Boling. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT075244.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boling v. Harcros Chemicals Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Elaine Water Works
Represented By: William C. Mann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harcros Chemicals Inc
Represented By: Michael D. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Boling
Represented By: Joseph B. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?