Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company v. Chi Ly et al
Plaintiff: Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Phuong Chi Ly, Dung Chi Ly, Stanley Ly, Hung Chi Ly, Khinn Vay Su and Cuong Chi Ly
Case Number: 2:2019cv00169
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/7/2020. Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/21/2020. Bench Trial set for 2/23/2021 at 9:30 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 2/28/20. (mmb)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Phuong Chi Ly.(Glover, Danny)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company (Bacon, Donald)
December 31, 2019 Filing 1 INTERPLEADER COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. (Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT075406.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company v. Chi Ly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phuong Chi Ly
Represented By: Danny W. Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dung Chi Ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hung Chi Ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khinn Vay Su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuong Chi Ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Donald H. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?