JAK Application LLC v. Mid-Continent Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: JAK Application LLC
Defendant: Rufus Comer Farms, Michael Coley, Jerry Reeves, Mid-Continet Casualty Insurance Company, Oklahoma Surety Company and Mid-Continent Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00025
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Response to Motion filed by Mid-Continent Casualty Insurance Company, Oklahoma Surety Company. (Thompson, Michael)
March 3, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mid-Continent Casualty Insurance Company, Oklahoma Surety Company. (Thompson, Michael)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Remand to State Court filed by JAK Application LLC. (Hodges, David)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by JAK Application LLC (Hodges, David)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Mid-Continent Casualty Insurance Company, Oklahoma Surety Company (Thompson, Michael)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Mid-Continent Casualty Insurance Company, Oklahoma Surety Company.(Thompson, Michael) (Docket text modified on 2/6/2020 to correct a typographical error)(jak)
February 4, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Michael Coley, Rufus Comer Farms.(ajt)
February 4, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by JAK Application LLC.(ajt)
February 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mid-Continet Casualty Insurance Company, Oklahoma Surety Company from Phillips County Circuit Court, case number CV-2019-270. Fee $400 paid, receipt number LIT075910. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAK Application LLC v. Mid-Continent Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rufus Comer Farms
Represented By: Daniel C. Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Coley
Represented By: Daniel C. Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Continet Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Zachary R. Trail
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Surety Company
Represented By: Zachary R. Trail
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Continent Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Zachary R. Trail
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAK Application LLC
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: Louis A. Etoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?