Bush v. USA
Plaintiff: Bush and Gabriel Bush
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 2:2020cv00054
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 motion to dismiss criminal charges that might be filed; and directing Mr. Bush to notify the Court within 30 days whether he intends to pursue civil rights claims at this time, after considering whether he has fully exhausted his administrative remedies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/17/2020. (jbh)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Gabriel Bush. (ljb)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk to enclose an application to proceed IFP and a jail account information sheet along with a copy of this order; and directing Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $400.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/27/2020. (jbh)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE filed by Gabriel Bush. (ljb)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against USA filed by Gabriel Bush. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bush v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?