Berkley Regional Insurance Company v. Buhler Inc
Plaintiff: Berkley Regional Insurance Company
Defendant: Buhler Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00088
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 8/19/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/1/2020; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 12/13/2021 at 09:30 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 06/24/2020. (rmg)
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel E. Hildebrand on behalf of Buhler Inc (Hildebrand, Rachel)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thaddeus S. Kirk on behalf of Berkley Regional Insurance Company (Kirk, Thaddeus)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Zielinski on behalf of Berkley Regional Insurance Company (Zielinski, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thaddeus S. Kirk. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 06/11/2020. (rmg)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey M. Zielinski. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 06/11/2020. (rmg)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Buhler Inc.(Fairley, John)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Carter Fairley on behalf of Buhler Inc (Fairley, John)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Thaddeus S. Kirk. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3721953. Filed by Berkley Regional Insurance Company (Parkey, Justin)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jeffrey M. Zielinski. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3721948. Filed by Berkley Regional Insurance Company (Parkey, Justin)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Berkley Regional Insurance Company. Buhler Inc served on 5/4/2020. (Parkey, Justin)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Berkley Regional Insurance Company. (Fee of $400. Receipt Number JON000896. Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berkley Regional Insurance Company v. Buhler Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkley Regional Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin Wayne Cole
Represented By: Justin Parkey
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Zielinski
Represented By: Thaddeus S. Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buhler Inc
Represented By: John Carter Fairley
Represented By: Rachel E. Hildebrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?