Ervin v. Turner et al
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Ervin
Defendant: Michael Neal, Angie Turner, Monroe County, Arkansas, John Doe and Southern Paramedic Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00120
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Southern Paramedic Services Inc (Harrison, Jennifer)
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer S. Harrison on behalf of Southern Paramedic Services Inc (Harrison, Jennifer)
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Southern Paramedic Services Inc.(Harrison, Jennifer)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/10/2020. Jury Trial set for 3/7/2022 at 9:30 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 6/25/2020. (slb)
June 24, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Monroe County, Arkansas, Michael Neal, Angie Turner.(Lewis, Kaylen)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 & #5 Summons Returned Executed and #6 & #7 Affidavit of Service. CORRECTION: The docket texts were modified to include the names of the parties served as marked on the documents. (jak)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Nathaniel Ervin. Southern Paramedic Services served on 6/4/2020. (Hodges, David) (Docket text modified on 6/11/2020 to include the party served) (jak)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Nathaniel Ervin. Monroe County served on 6/5/2020. (Hodges, David) (Docket text modified on 6/11/2020 to include the party served) (jak)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nathaniel Ervin. Michael Neal served on 6/4/2020. (Hodges, David) (Docket text modified on 6/11/2020 to include the party served)(jak)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nathaniel Ervin. Angie Turner served on 6/4/2020 (Hodges, David)(Docket text modified on 6/11/2020 to include the party served) (jak)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original civil cover sheet was submitted in error (lack of signature). The correct civil cover sheet was added as an attachment to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT AS TO UNKNOWN TORTFEASOR by David Hodges. (jbh)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nathaniel Ervin. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT077438.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet Correct - submitted 6/1/2020) (jak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ervin v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe County, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Paramedic Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Ervin
Represented By: Robert Lewis
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: Louis A. Etoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?