Brooks v. Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ethel Brooks
Defendant: Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00144
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company re #11 Affidavit Letter to the Court (Jones, Kaleb)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT by Ethel Brooks. (Simes, Alvin)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 Response to Motion filed by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. (Jones, Kaleb)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 Motion to Remand filed by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. (Jones, Kaleb)
July 21, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 Response. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the filing event to show as a pending Motion to Remand pursuant to instruction from Chambers. (jak)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company (Jones, Kaleb)
July 14, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 Answer and #7 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The docket text for docket entry #6 was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "Response to #1 Notice of Removal" as marked on the document. The docket text for docket entry #7 was modified to correct the linkage as "Brief in Support re #6 Response" as marked on the document. (jak)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Response filed by All Plaintiffs. (Simes, Alvin) (Docket text modified on 7/14/2020 to correct the linkage)(jak)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #1 Notice of Removal and MOTION to Remand by Ethel Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Simes, Alvin) (Docket text modified on 7/14/2020 to correct the description of the document filed and to establish linkage) (jak)(Docket entry modified on 7/21/2020 to correct the filing event to show as a pending motion pursuant to instruction from Chambers) (jak)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/16/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/29/2020; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 12/13/2021 at 09:30 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 07/10/2020. (rmg)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to #1 and hereto for service/review by the parties. (kbc)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company.(kdr)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Ethel Brooks.(kdr)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company from Lee County Circuit Court, case number 39CV-20-58. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT078009. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) Additional attachment added on 7/10/2020: #2 Main Document - Correct. (kbc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kaleb M. Jones
Represented By: Andy Lee Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel Brooks
Represented By: Alvin Leonard Simes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?