SAIA Motor Freight Line LLC v. Averitt Express Inc et al
Plaintiff: SAIA Motor Freight Line LLC
Defendant: Harold Bibbs & Sons Trucking Inc, Tommy Eugene Cobb, William Charles Beers, Jr and Averitt Express Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00150
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER to the Clerk for the Circuit Court of Crittenden County transmitting a copy of the case file and certified copies of docket entry 6 Order to Remand and the docket sheet via certified mail. (jak)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion to remand, Doc. #4 , granted. The case is remanded to the Circuit Court of Crittenden County. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/22/2020. (slb)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Strike Notice of Removal and to Remand Case filed by Averitt Express Inc, William Charles Beers, Jr. (jap)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Strike Notice of Removal #1 and to Remand Case by Averitt Express Inc, William Charles Beers, Jr (jap)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Civil Cover Sheet. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (no original signature). The correct document was added as an attachment to #1 docket entry and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (cmn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by SAIA Motor Freight Line LLC.(ajt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Averitt Express Inc, William Charles Beers, Jr from Crittenden County Circuit Court, case number CV-2020-317. Fee $400 paid, receipt number LIT078114. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/21/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet - Correct) (cmn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAIA Motor Freight Line LLC v. Averitt Express Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Bibbs & Sons Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Eugene Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Charles Beers, Jr
Represented By: Martin Zummach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Averitt Express Inc
Represented By: Martin Zummach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAIA Motor Freight Line LLC
Represented By: John Lewis Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?