Terry v. Larry et al
Plaintiff: Jarell D Terry
Defendant: Alicia Williams, Baines, Sidney Larry, Kathey Baxter and D Maiden
Case Number: 2:2020cv00155
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #8 Motion for Hearing. Any motion concerning the admission of evidence is premature. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 09/16/2020. (dml)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Suppression Hearing by Jarell D Terry. (kdr)
September 4, 2020 Summons Issued as to Sidney Larry and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare a summons for defendant Larry and the United States Marshal to serve a copy of #5 amended complaint and summons without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/4/2020. (ljb)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND PARTIAL RECOMMENDATION recommending that Terry's excessive force claim against Larry proceed, and that Terry's other claims be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/4/2020. (ljb)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Jarell D Terry. (llg)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF filed by Jarell D Terry. (llg)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the East Arkansas Regional Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralization Bank Office, and the ADC Compliance Office; directing Terry to amend his complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order to clarify his claims; and directing the Clerk of Court to send a blank 1983 complaint form to Terry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 7/23/2020. (ljb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Jarell D Terry. (ljb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jarell D Terry. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry v. Larry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarell D Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney Larry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathey Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Maiden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?