Roebuck v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Demario Roebuck and Demarin Roebuck
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00163
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Hodges on behalf of Demario Roebuck (Hodges, David)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Demario Roebuck. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company served on 7/10/2020. (Etoch, Louis)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (jbh)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Demario Roebuck. (jbh)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company from St. Francis County Circuit Court, case number 62CV-20-00119. Fee of $400 paid; receipt number LIT078248. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roebuck v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demario Roebuck
Represented By: Louis A. Etoch
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demarin Roebuck
Represented By: Louis A. Etoch
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: James Melton Sayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?