Thornsberry v. Kerstein et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Allen Thornsberry
Defendant: Gary R Kerstein, Jeffrey Stieve, M Kelly, Woodard, Terri Moody, Tracy Bennett and Anthony Jackson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00182
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 32 INTRODUCTION of Exhibits by Christopher Allen Thornsberry. (llg)
October 30, 2020 Filing 31 INTRODUCTION of Exhibit by Christopher Allen Thornsberry. (llg)
October 23, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to Interrogatories of Dr. Kerstein by Christopher Allen Thornsberry. (ljb)
October 23, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to Interrogatories of Terri Moody by Christopher Allen Thornsberry. (ljb)
October 23, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to Interrogatories of Tracy Bennett by Christopher Allen Thornsberry. (ljb)
October 21, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Court Order by Christopher Allen Thornsberry. (llg)
October 21, 2020 Filing 26 REQUEST for Production of Documents by Christopher Allen Thornsberry. (llg)
October 21, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time by Christopher Allen Thornsberry. (llg)
October 14, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by Christopher Allen Thornsberry. (llg)
October 14, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Discovery by Christopher Allen Thornsberry. (llg)
October 14, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #14 Answer by Christopher Allen Thornsberry. (llg)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare a new summons for Defendant Stieve; and directing the Marshal to serve this Defendant with a summons and a copy of the #1 complaint and #2 addendum, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/7/2020. (jbh)
October 7, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #2 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #2 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Anthony Jackson, M Kelly, Woodard.(Strange, Sam)
October 7, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Sam P. Strange, Jr on behalf of Anthony Jackson, M Kelly, Woodard (Strange, Sam)
October 7, 2020 Summons Reissued as to Jeffrey Stieve and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh)
October 6, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Jeffrey Stieve. Address Under Seal. (fjg)
October 6, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Terri Moody served on 10/5/2020. (fjg)
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Gary R Kerstein served on 10/5/2020. (fjg)
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Tracy Bennett served on 10/5/2020. (fjg)
October 5, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #14 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove duplicate text. (jak)
October 2, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #2 Amended Complaint by Tracy Bennett, Gary R Kerstein, Terri Moody.(Eubanks, Brent) (Docket text modified on 10/5/2020 to remove duplicate text) (jak)
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Jay Eubanks on behalf of Tracy Bennett, Gary R Kerstein, Terri Moody (Eubanks, Brent)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Woodard served on 9/21/2020. (fjg)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed. M Kelly served on 9/21/2020. (fjg)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Anthony Jackson served on 9/21/2020. (fjg)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the Clerk to terminate the #8 pending motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/22/2020. (jbh)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION of Inquiry by Christopher Allen Thornsberry. (llg)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk to terminate the #6 pending motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/16/2020. (jbh)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Status by Christopher Allen Thornsberry. (ljb)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for the Defendants; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve each Defendant with a summons and a copy of the #1 complaint, with any attachments, and the #2 addendum, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/8/2020. (jbh)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #3 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the East Arkansas Regional Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/8/2020. (jbh)
September 8, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Allen Thornsberry. (ljb)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 ADDENDUM to #1 Complaint filed by Christopher Allen Thornsberry. (ljb)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Christopher Allen Thornsberry. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thornsberry v. Kerstein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary R Kerstein
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Stieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Kelly
Represented By: Sam P. Strange, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodard
Represented By: Sam P. Strange, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Moody
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Bennett
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Jackson
Represented By: Sam P. Strange, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Allen Thornsberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?