Billups v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Dorothea Billups
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00228
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 2/1/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/16/2021; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 4/4/2022 at 09:30 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 11/24/2020. (rmg)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Reviere, Russell)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Reviere, Russell)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Notice of Removal and coversheet lack an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (jak) (Docket text modified on 11/16/2020 to correct a typographical error) (jak)
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company filed by Dorothea Billups.(bmd)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company from Phillips County Circuit Court, case number CV-20-200. Fee $400 received, receipt number LIT079759. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2020: #2 Main Document - Correct, #3 Civil Cover Sheet - Correct) (cmn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Billups v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothea Billups
Represented By: Charles P. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Russell E. Reviere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?