Hawkins v. Heard et al
Plaintiff: Andre Hawkins
Defendant: Coby Heard and Dermott, City of
Case Number: 2:2021cv00055
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2021 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 8/19/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/1/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 11/28/2022 at 9:30 a.m. in Helena Courtroom #314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/18/2021. (ljb)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 motion to withdraw as attorney for Separate Defendant Coby Heard filed by Attorney Jenna Adams. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/14/2021. (ljb)
June 14, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include reference to the Jury demand as marked on the document.(jak)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Dermott, City of.(Adams, Jenna)
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Separate Defendant Coby Heard by Coby Heard (Adams, Jenna)
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury demand by Coby Heard.(Wren, Matthew) (Docket text modified on 6/14/2021 to include reference to the Jury demand) (jak)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 motion to extend time. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/27/2021.(gmh)
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Dermott, City of, Coby Heard (Adams, Jenna)
May 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Adams on behalf of Dermott, City of, Coby Heard (Adams, Jenna)
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andre Hawkins. Coby Heard served on 5/17/2021. (Sutter, Luther)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andre Hawkins on the City of Dermott, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andre Hawkins. Dermott, City of served on 5/17/2021. (Sutter, Luther)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Andre Hawkins. Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT082129. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Heard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coby Heard
Represented By: Jenna Adams
Represented By: Matthew Keith Wren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dermott, City of
Represented By: Jenna Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Hawkins
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?