Ogle v. Covenant Transport Inc et al
Plaintiff: William Ogle
Defendant: Covenant Transport Inc and Christopher Moore
Case Number: 2:2021cv00128
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/3/2021. (rmg)
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time to Serve Defendant Christopher Moore by William Ogle (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hartness, Matthew)
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Covenant Transport Inc (Deacon, Joseph)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/8/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/21/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 4/3/2023 at 9:30 a.m. in Helena Courtroom #314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 10/4/2021. (ljb)
October 1, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include "with Jury Demand" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John Walker Williams on behalf of Covenant Transport Inc, Christopher Moore (Williams, John)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER with Jury Demand to #2 Complaint by Covenant Transport Inc.(Deacon, Joseph) (Docket text modified on 10/1/2021 to include jury demand.)(cmn)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by William Ogle.(ldb)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Jury Demand by All Defendants from St. Francis County Circuit Court, case number 62CV-21-117-2. Fee $ 402 paid, receipt number LIT083857. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ogle v. Covenant Transport Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ogle
Represented By: Matthew Eugene Hartness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covenant Transport Inc
Represented By: Joseph Barrett Deacon, Jr.
Represented By: John Walker Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Moore
Represented By: Joseph Barrett Deacon, Jr.
Represented By: John Walker Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?