Reign v. Barton et al
Plaintiff: Isaiah Reign
Defendant: Roosevelt Barton, Tevin Smith, Dennis Ugbaji, Cameran Moore, Leavy Watson, Terrance Daniels and Carla Akins
Case Number: 2:2021cv00140
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Edie R Ervin
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 19 OBJECTION to #18 Partial Recommended Disposition by Isaiah Reign. (llg)
December 1, 2021 Filing 18 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending #7 motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by Defendants Barton, Watson, and Akins be granted, in part, and denied, in part; recommending Mr. Reign's claims for money damages from all Defendants in their official capacity be dismissed, with prejudice; and recommending Mr. Reign be allowed to proceed on his: (1) excessive-force claims against Defendant Barton and Smith in their individual capacity; and (2) failure-to-protect claims against Moore, Ugbaji, Watson, Daniels, and Akins in their individual capacity. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 12/01/2021. (llg)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare new summonses for Defendants Daniels, Moore, Ugbaji, and Smith; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the reissued summonses, the #2 complaint, and this Order on Defendants Daniels, Moore, Ugbahi, and Smith without prepayment of fees or costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 11/29/2021. (jbh)
November 29, 2021 Summons Reissued as to Terrance Daniels, Cameran Moore, Tevin Smith, Dennis Ugbaji and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh)
November 19, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Isaiah Reign. (llg)
November 19, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Roosevelt Barton served on 11/5/2021. (fjg)
November 19, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Tevin Smith. Address Under Seal. (fjg)
November 19, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Dennis Ugbaji. Address Under Seal. (fjg)
November 19, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Cameran Moore. Address Under Seal. (fjg)
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Leavy Watson served on 11/5/2021. (fjg)
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Terrance Daniels. Address Under Seal. (fjg)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Carla Akins served on 11/5/2021. (fjg)
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Carla Akins, Roosevelt Barton, Leavy Watson. (Jackson, Maryna)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Carla Akins, Roosevelt Barton, Leavy Watson (Jackson, Maryna)
November 11, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Carla Akins, Roosevelt Barton, Leavy Watson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jackson, Maryna)
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Maryna O. Jackson on behalf of Carla Akins, Roosevelt Barton, Leavy Watson (Jackson, Maryna)
October 26, 2021 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Roosevelt Barton, Tevin Smith, Dennis Ugbaji, Cameran Moore, Leavy Watson, Terrance Daniels, and Carla Akins; directing the U.S. Marshal to serve each of these Defendants with a summons and a copy of the #2 complaint, including any attachments, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security; and reminding Defendants of their obligation to preserve any relevant video footage of the underlying incident that allegedly occurred on 7/21/2021 between 12:15 and 12:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/25/2021. (jbh)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the East Arkansas Regional Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/25/2021. (jbh)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Isaiah Reign. (llg)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Isaiah Reign. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reign v. Barton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Reign
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roosevelt Barton
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tevin Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Ugbaji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameran Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leavy Watson
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Akins
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?