Strickland v. Swopes et al
Plaintiff: Devonte Strickland
Defendant: Adam Swopes, Johnny Lomac and Trent Smith
Case Number: 2:2021cv00142
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Stricklands Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Strickland's institutional account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to Administrator of the Dallas County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/13/2021. (llg)
December 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Devonte Strickland. (kdr)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS directing Plaintiff to on or before 12/20/2021, either: (1) pay the $402 filing fee in full; or (2) file a properly completed IFP Motion, along with a properly completed prison trust fund account statement and calculation sheet signed by an authorized prison official, if he wishes to pursue this action; directing the Clerk to send him an IFP application, along with a copy of this Order; and directing the Detention Center officials to assist in completing the necessary forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/19/2021. (kdr)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to #1 docket entry and is attached hereto for service/review by the parties. (cmn)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Devonte Strickland, filed by Devonte Strickland.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strickland v. Swopes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devonte Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Swopes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Lomac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?