Horton et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Charles Horton and Cathy Horton
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00149
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Filing 10 Letter to the Clerk for the Circuit Court of Crittenden County transmitting a copy of the case file and certified copies of #9 Order to Remand and the docket sheet via certified mail. (ldb)
December 1, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 Stipulation. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party filers as Charles and Cathy Horton as marked on the document. (jak)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion to Remand to State Court; and remanding to Crittenden County, Arkansas, Circuit Court. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/30/2021. (ldb)
November 30, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs (Sumpter, Roger)
November 30, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION by Charles Horton and Cathy Horton. (Sumpter, Roger) (Docket text modified on 12/1/2021 to correct the party filers)(jak)
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 1/19/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/2/2022. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 1/23/2023 at 9:15 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge James M. Moody Jr.Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Partial filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Runyon, Emily)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Partial by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Runyon, Emily)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 Partial ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Runyon, Emily)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company filed by Charles Horton, Cathy Horton. (llg)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Crittenden County Circuit Court, case number 18-cv-21-00599. Filing Fee of $402 paid, receipt number LIT084472. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Horton
Represented By: Roger Dennis Sumpter, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Horton
Represented By: Roger Dennis Sumpter, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Emily M. Runyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?