Brown v. Family Dollar Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Brown
Defendant: Family Dollar Inc and Dollar Tree Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00040
Filed: March 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond to Kimberly Brown's class action complaint. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to Brown's complaint within 45 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues an order on the pending motion for transfer and coordination or consolidation. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/4/2022. (ldb)
April 1, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Dollar Tree Inc, Family Dollar Inc (Campbell, Katherine)
April 1, 2022 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Repond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by All Defendants (Campbell, Katherine)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Gregory W. Aleshire. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/1/2022. (ljb)
March 29, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Gregory W. Aleshire. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4233003. Filed by Kimberly Brown (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Gregory W. Aleshire in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Garner, Jerry)
March 10, 2022 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Kimberly Brown. Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT085904. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Family Dollar Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Brown
Represented By: Gregory W. Aleshire
Represented By: James D. Robertson
Represented By: Jerry D. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Inc
Represented By: Katherine Church Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Inc
Represented By: Katherine Church Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?