Hurt v. Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Charles Francis Hurt, Jr
Defendant: Department of Justice, Smith, Alice, Does Lieutenant, Correctons Officer and USA
Case Number: 2:2022cv00048
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Summons must be sent to the Department of Justice. The proper defendant in an FTCA case is the United States of America and that Recommended Disposition is still pending. Accordingly, Plaintiff should be patient and his motion is denied #20 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/23/2022. (lej)
May 20, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Correct by Charles Francis Hurt, Jr. (llg)
May 10, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed. USA c/o U.S. Attorney General served on 5/5/2022. (kth)
May 10, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed. USA c/o U.S. Attorney Eastern District of Arkansas served on 5/2/2022. (kth)
April 13, 2022 Summons Issued as to USA, and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service, pursuant to #17 Order. (jbh)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that the Clerk shall prepare a summons for Defendant United States of America and the USM shall serve Defendant without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/13/2022. (lej)
April 13, 2022 Filing 16 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff be allowed to proceed with his FTCA claims against Defendant United States of America. The Department of Justice, Bureau of Prisons, Corrections Officer Smith, Corrections Officer "Alice" and Does be dismissed without prejudice from this lawsuit because Plaintiff has not pled any plausible claims against them. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/13/2022. (lej)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion for leave to file amended complaint #12 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/12/2022. (lej)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion for order #11 . The Court previously determined service was not yet appropriate. The Court will issue summons at the appropriate time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/11/2022. (lej)
April 11, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Charles Francis Hurt, Jr. (ldb)
April 11, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend #1 Complaint by Charles Francis Hurt, Jr. (ldb)
April 11, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Summons by Charles Francis Hurt, Jr. (ldb)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Plaintiff seeks that the Court provide copies of the "court or clerks office requirements, rules, and regulations so that as a pro se litigant [he will be] provided a fair hearing before the Court." The Court must remain neutral and cannot provide legal advice or guidance to Plaintiff. Accordingly, his Motion is denied #9 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/4/2022. (lej)
April 4, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Status Update by Charles Francis Hurt, Jr. (llg)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiff's IFP Application #3 . The Clerk shall mail a copy of this order to the Federal Medical Center Warden. Service is not appropriate at this time. The Clerk shall mail a 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint form to Plaintiff with a copy of this order. If Plaintiff wishes to amend the complaint, he must complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, mark it as "Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's complaint, as it now stands, is deficient and may be dismissed after 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 3/30/2022. (lej)
March 25, 2022 Filing 7 Case electronically transferred in from the U.S. District Court, Northern District of Texas; Case Number 4:22-cv-00207. Electronic file copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received.
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF TRANSFER...It is therefore ORDERED that this case be, and is hereby, TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas, Eastern Division. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/24/2022) (wxc) [Transferred from txnd on 3/25/2022.]
March 24, 2022 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4,5. Thu Mar 24 10:48:49 CDT 2022 (crt) [Transferred from txnd on 3/25/2022.]
March 23, 2022 Filing 5 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (bdb) [Transferred from txnd on 3/25/2022.]
March 23, 2022 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: appropriate staff attorney. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (bdb) [Transferred from txnd on 3/25/2022.]
March 23, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Charles Francis Hurt, Jr. (bdb) [Transferred from txnd on 3/25/2022.]
March 23, 2022 Filing 2 Affidavit of Truth and Facts filed by Charles Francis Hurt, Jr re #1 Complaint. (bdb) [Transferred from txnd on 3/25/2022.]
March 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU Alice, Department of Justice/Bureau of Prisons, Lt. Unknown Name, FNU Smith, Unknown Corrections Officer filed by Charles Francis Hurt, Jr. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bdb) [Transferred from txnd on 3/25/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurt v. Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Francis Hurt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Lieutenant, Correctons Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?