Catlett et al v. Eck & Glass Inc et al
Plaintiff: Adam Catlett and Josh Bartlett
Defendant: Eck & Glass Inc and Cummins Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00099
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren M Wacker on behalf of Cummins Inc (Wacker, Lauren)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 07/01/2022. (mwr)
June 30, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Lauren Mager Wacker. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4297401. Filed by Cummins Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baker, John)
June 10, 2022 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Cummins Inc.(Baker, John)
June 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Notice of Appearance. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (editable image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #5 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
June 6, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Katherine Calvert on behalf of Eck & Glass Inc (Calvert, Sarah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2022: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 6/8/2022)) (jak).
June 6, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bailey Heister on behalf of Eck & Glass Inc (Heister, Michael)
June 6, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Cummins Inc (Baker, John)
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Adam Catlett, Josh Bartlett against All Defendants. (ldb)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cummins Inc from Phillips County Circuit Court, case number 54CV-22-65. Fee $402, receipt number LIT087004. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catlett et al v. Eck & Glass Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Catlett
Represented By: Robert Brooks Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Bartlett
Represented By: Robert Brooks Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eck & Glass Inc
Represented By: Michael Bailey Heister
Represented By: Sarah Katherine Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins Inc
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: Lauren Mager Wacker
Represented By: Lauren M Wacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?