Dunlop v. Yates
Plaintiff: Josh D Dunlop
Defendant: John P Yates
Case Number: 2:2022cv00204
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 Motion. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document was filed in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. (cmn)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to serve a copy of #9 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and this Order on the respondent and the U.S. Attorney by regular mail. Respondent shall file an answer, motion, or other pleading responsive to the Petition, in conformity with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts, within 40 days after service of the Petition, exclusive of the day of service. Additionally, the #6 Order directing Petitioner to file a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus within 30 days dated 12/7/2022, shall be rescinded. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/7/2022. (jbh)
December 7, 2022 Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD. (jak) (Docket text modified on 12/14/2022 to indicate the document was filed in error pursuant to instruction from Chambers.) (cmn)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Petitioner to file a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus within 30 days of the date of this Order if he wishes to proceed with this action; and directing the Clerk to re-file what is currently filed as the #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as a Miscellaneous Motion for Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/7/2022. (jbh)
December 5, 2022 Filing 9 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Josh D Dunlop. (llg)
December 5, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by Josh D Dunlop. (llg)
November 22, 2022 Filing 5 Filing Fee Received: $5.00, Receipt Number LIT089116. (jap)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Clerk shall mail to Petitioner an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees and Costs with a calculation sheet. If Petitioner wishes to proceed with this action, he must, within 30 days of the date of this order, either (1) pay the $5 statutory filing fee in full; or (2) file a properly completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs with a calculation sheet. Failure to timely and properly comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice, pursuant to LR 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/8/2022. (lej)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying as frivolous Petitioner's motion for order #2 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/7/2022. (lej)
November 7, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Order by Josh D Dunlop. (llg)
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Josh D Dunlop. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunlop v. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh D Dunlop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?