Moreno v. MB Global Logistics Inc et al
Plaintiff: Tomas Moreno
Defendant: MB Global Logistics Inc, Bradley Richard Simon and John Does
Case Number: 2:2025cv00037
Filed: February 20, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2025 Filing 8 Deficiency Letter notifying party that #6 , #7 Affidavits lack a case number. See Local Rule 5.5(a). (jbh)
March 5, 2025 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Tomas Moreno. MB Global Logistics Inc served on 1/21/2025., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tomas Moreno (Mason, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/10/2025: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 3/10/2025)) (jak).
March 5, 2025 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Tomas Moreno. Bradley Richard Simon served on 1/29/2025., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tomas Moreno (Mason, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/10/2025: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 3/10/2025)) (jak).
February 24, 2025 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by MB Global Logistics Inc (Sallings, Jerry)
February 21, 2025 Filing 4 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re #3 Answer notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (jak)
February 20, 2025 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by MB Global Logistics Inc. (ajj)
February 20, 2025 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Tomas Moreno. (ajj)
February 20, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MB Global Logistics Inc from Crittenden County Circuit Court, case number 18CV-25-47. Fee of $405 paid. Receipt Number LIT9577. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ajj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno v. MB Global Logistics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Moreno
Represented By: Timothy Ryan Scott
Represented By: Samuel Mason
Represented By: Sach D. Oliver
Represented By: Geoff Hamby
Represented By: Andrea D. McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MB Global Logistics Inc
Represented By: Jordan Jones
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Richard Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?