USA, et al v. Lifetime Medical, et al

Plaintiff: United States of America and Lorinda McMillan
Defendant: Lifetime Medical Supply Inc, Russell Crowell, Terry Carr and Greenbear Healthcare
Case Number: 3:2003cv00353
Filed: August 27, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This matter came before the Court for hearing on 8/24/2010; granting Relator's oral motion for release of a Relator's share of 30% of the proceeds recovered by the USA from defendant Lifetime Medical Supply, for a total award to Relator of $40,217.39. The CMS and the USA are directed to release Relator's share of the recovered funds within 45 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/26/2010. (thd)
August 24, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Lorinda McMillan in the amount of $134,057.95 against Defendants Lifetime Medical Supply, Inc., Russell Crowell & Terry Carr. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/24/2010. (jct)
August 27, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER advising attorneys to respond regarding dispositive motions. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/27/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA, et al v. Lifetime Medical, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Patricia R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorinda McMillan
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifetime Medical Supply Inc
Represented By: Michael R. Bearden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Crowell
Represented By: Michael R. Bearden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Carr
Represented By: Michael R. Bearden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenbear Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?