Bennett, et al v. Nucor Corporation, et al

Plaintiff: Cornelius Bennett, Sylvester Rogers, Rodney Washington, Clifton Lee, Sr, Ozzie Green and Larry McBride
Defendant: Nucor Corporation and Nucor-Yamato Steel Company
Objector: John G Veres, III
Movant: Dawson Employment Service Inc and Lexicon Inc
Case Number: 3:2004cv00291
Filed: January 7, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2012 329 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 316 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 317 Motion for Attorney Fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that attorney fees be awarded to Plaintiffs in the amount of $920,688 and costs be awarded to Plaintiffs in the amount of $136,977.12. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 09/10/2012. (jak)
December 29, 2011 321 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 320 Defendants' Motion to stay all proceedings with respect to 316 & 317 pending Motions for attorneys' fees. Attorney fee proceedings, including the deadline for responses, are stayed until 30 days after the parties' petitions for writ of certiorari have been resolved. The parties are directed to file notice w/i 5 days after disposition of the petitions. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/29/2011. (jct)
January 7, 2010 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 272 Motion to Intervene filed by Melvin Wright, Jerome Bogan, Johnny Banks, Charles Wells, Jeff Stone, Bruce Henley, Lamar Freeman, Wilson Done, George Reed, Ed Rhodes, Carlos Chambers, Jerry Wilson & Leslie Chalk. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/7/2010. (jct)
November 4, 2009 267 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT re 266 ordering that each Plaintiff, Clifton Lee, Sr., Cornelius Bennett, Larry McBride, Ozzie Green, Rodney Washington, Sylvester Rogers, have & recover of & from the Defendants Nucor Corporation & Nucor-Yamato Steel Compa ny, L.P, the sum of $100,000 for compensatory damages & $100,000 for punitive damages for a total of $1,200,000, together with interest from this date until paid at the rate of 0.39% per annum as provided by law, and their costs. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff Clifton Lee, Sr. has not proved the elements of his claim of retaliation against Defendants Nucor Corporation & Nucor Yamato Steel Company, L.P., & that claim is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/4/09. (jct)
October 16, 2009 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part as stated Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine 235 , 239 , 240 , 241 , 242 & 243 . Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/16/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett, et al v. Nucor Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Bennett
Represented By: Nate Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvester Rogers
Represented By: Nate Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Washington
Represented By: Nate Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Lee, Sr
Represented By: Nate Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ozzie Green
Represented By: Nate Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry McBride
Represented By: Nate Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nucor Corporation
Represented By: Richard D. Alaniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nucor-Yamato Steel Company
Represented By: Richard D. Alaniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: John G Veres, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Dawson Employment Service Inc
Represented By: Robert L. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Lexicon Inc
Represented By: Robert L. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?