Two Tennessee LLC et al v. North Little Rock Arkansas, City of et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00063
Filed: April 18, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2009 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 96 Joint Motion to Dismiss and dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/25/09. (bkp)
August 17, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 80 Joint MOTION to Continue. The 9/21/09 trial date is removed from the Court's docket. A new trial date & scheduling deadlines will be set by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/17/09. (jct)
July 21, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 84 MOTION to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions filed by North Little Rock Arkansas, City of. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is hereby extended up to & including 8/14/09. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/21/09. (jct)
January 21, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 77 Joint MOTION to Continue. The trial of this matter previously set for 5/4/09 is removed from the Court's docket. A new trial date & scheduling deadlines will be set by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/21/09. (jct)
October 15, 2008 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 MOTION to Continue Trial and All Deadlines & 70 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by North Little Rock Arkansas, City of. Robert L Beard Jr is substituted as counsel of record for defendant & Angela R Echols is hereby relieve d as counsel in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the trial of this matter previously set for 11/24/08 is removed from the Court's docket. A new trial date & scheduling deadlines will be set by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/15/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Two Tennessee LLC et al v. North Little Rock Arkansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?