Sexton et al v. Hutton et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00163
Filed: September 7, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2009 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 128 130 Motions for Attorney Fees; Plaintiff is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $41,300 and costs in the amount of $7,130.20. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/2/2009. (mkf)
June 3, 2009 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 123 Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting 131 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendant shall have fourteen days from date of this Order to file his response to 128 & ]130] Plaintiff's motions for attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/3/09. (jct)
February 25, 2009 121 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 117 Jury Verdict, in favor of Ernest Sexton against Dan Ellison, in his official capacity as Sheriff of Lawrence County, Arkansas. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiff Ernest Sexton have and recover from Lawrence County, Arkansas, damages in the amount of $30,000.00. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/25/09. (jct)
February 19, 2009 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to General Order No. 54, Lucien Gillham, Lois Palmer, Joanne Sexton, Ernest Sexton, C. Burt Newell & Dan Ellison are authorized to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, &/or personal digital assistant into the Jonesboro U.S.Courthouse between February 23 and February 25, 2009, subject to the stated rules. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/19/09. (jct)
February 12, 2009 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 106 Plaintiffs' Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum or motion for continuance; granting in part and denying in part 108 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine; denying 109 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to use depositions at trial. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/12/09. (jct)
November 19, 2008 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 97 plaintiffs' Third Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice to renew 102 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/19/08. (jct)
October 1, 2008 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 92 Defendant's counter motion for partial summary judgment & finding that Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Robbins are barred by the statute of limitations. Therefore, the Court finds that Delbert Robbins is entitled to summary judgment & hereby dismisses the case against him with prejudice; denying 88 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/1/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sexton et al v. Hutton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?