USA v. Ridge et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00179
Filed: September 29, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
Presiding Judge: G. Thomas Eisele
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED ORDER of Distribution, pursuant to 54 Order Confirming Marshal's Sale, directing the U.S. Marshal to transfer funds from the sale as directed. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 8/19/2010. (jct)
August 4, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER of Distribution, pursuant to 54 Order Confirming Marshal's Sale, directing U.S. Marshal to transfer funds from the sale as directed. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 8/4/2010. (jct)
October 2, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT by Defendants Jimmy D. Bowman and Evelyn Bowman, his wife; Plaintiff USA, U.S. Department of Agriculture, Farm Service Agency, is hereby awarded judgment in rem against the property; no personal judgment rendered; the lien of Bowman Bros. Inc, shall constitute a first lien on the property in the amount of $18,232.08 as judgment in rem against the property plus attorney fees in the amount of $1,823.20; Plaintiff, USA, has a second lien and is entitled to judgment in rem in the principal sum of $93,028.41, interest in the sum of $$8,900.03 accrued to August 12, 2009 and thereafter at the daily rate of $9.62 to the date of the entry of this Judgment, and thereafter at the statutory rate of.41% ; pursuant to 28 USC 1961, plus any additional advances and recoverable charges made during the pendency of this action amd costs of $300.00; Defendants unknown tenants are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 10/2/09. (mkf)
July 14, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff, if it intends to pursue this action, to file promptly a motion for summary judgment or, alternatively, a pleading proposing its plan for the prompt resolution of this action. The deadline for doing so is 8/14/09. Plaintiff is placed on notice that if it fails to respond to this Order by that date, this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 7/14/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Ridge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?