Dintelman v. USA

Plaintiff: Jeane L Dintelman
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 3:2007cv00081
Filed: June 20, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2012 122 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of USA on its Counterclaim asserted against Jeane L Dintelman Fortner for the unpaid balances of the "trust fund recovery penalties" assessed against Jeane Dintelman Fortner, plus all accrued interest, that relate to the f ederal employment taxes that were required to be withheld from the wages of employees of Elite Medical Services, Inc., & paid to the United States for the fourth quarter of 2002 & the first three quarters of 2003, which total $57,334.63 as of Fe bruary 10, 2012, plus interest accruing thereafter as provided by law, pursuant to 26 U.S.C. Section 6621, until paid. IT IS ORDERED that Jeane Dintelman Fortner shall not recover any amount from the United States by way of her Complaint filed in this action, & that such Complaint is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/14/2012. (jct)
February 3, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court COURT'S FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW & ORDER Directing Proposed Judgment, finding that Plaintiff's claims should be dismissed with prejudice & that judgment should be entered in favor of the United States for the balance of trust fund penalties assessed against her, along with accrued & unassessed interest & penalties until the judgment is paid. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the parties are directed to submit an agreed, proposed judgment, w/i 10 days from the entry date of t his Order. If the parties are unable to submit an agreed judgment, the United States shall submit a proposed judgment w/i 10 days from the entry date of this Order, & Plaintiff shall submit her objections w/i 5 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/3/2012. (jct)
September 29, 2011 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rescheduling Bench Trial for 1/23/2012 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A530 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. All the deadlines remain as previously scheduled & consistent with the new date. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/29/2011. (jct)
May 18, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 96 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue., (Bench Trial rescheduled for week beginning 8/29/2011 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1D before Judge Susan Webber Wright.) All deadlines remain as previously scheduled & consistent with the new trial date. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/28/2011. (jct)
January 7, 2010 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 86 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/7/2010. (jct)
July 22, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response. The United States has up to & including 8/14/09 in which to file a response to 47 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment. The 8/31/09 trial date is continued & will be set by a separate Order at a later date. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/22/09. (jct)
July 21, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 USA's Motion to Strike Dintelman's motion for summary judgment. The United States is granted up to & including 14 days from the entry date of this Order in which to respond to 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/21/09. (jct)
March 3, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 39 Defendant's Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/3/09. (jct)
February 5, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rescheduling Bench Trial for week of 8/31/2009 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #1D before Judge Susan Webber Wright. All deadlines have expired therefore any extensions will be by Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/5/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dintelman v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeane L Dintelman
Represented By: Eugene G. Sayre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?