S S et al v. Bono Police Department et al

Plaintiff: S S and D S
Defendant: Bono Police Department and Ricky D Duhon
Case Number: 3:2007cv00124
Filed: September 7, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to a settlement between the parties; and directing the Clerk to forthwith serve copies of this Order upon the attorneys for the parties appearing in this action. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/10/09. (bkp)
July 8, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 84 Defendants' MOTION for Protective Order, a ruling will be made on 7/14/09. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/8/09. (jct)
July 7, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER, re FRE 412 Motion, directing attorneys to give specific citations of authority by noon, 7/8/09, with copies to opposing counsel. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/7/09. (jct)
July 6, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Defendants' First Motion in Limine; denying 58 Defendants' Third Motion in Limine; granting 59 Defendants' Fifth Motion in Limine; granting 60 Defendants' Sixth Motion in Limine; granting 61 Defendants& #039; Second Motion in Limine; holding in abeyance a ruling on 62 Defendants' Fourth Motion in Limine; granting 63 Defendants' Seventh Motion in Limine; granting in part, denying in part & holding in abeyance in part ruling on 64 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/6/09. (jct)
October 23, 2008 46 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting 45 MOTION to Continue. The case is reset on the Court's docket to begin on 7/14/09. No new deadlines are being set with the exception of the submission of an agreed set of Jury Instructions which is due on 7/1/09. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/23/08. (jct)
October 16, 2008 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/16/08. (jct)
October 1, 2008 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, based on findings of fact and conclusions of law, DENYING 23 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; DENYING 26 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/1/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S S et al v. Bono Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S S
Represented By: Jay Scholtens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D S
Represented By: Jay Scholtens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bono Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky D Duhon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?