Jones v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Johnnie Lee Jones
Defendant: Eddie L Smith and USF Holland Inc
Case Number: 3:2007cv00130
Filed: September 19, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 97 Plaintiff & Intervenor's Motion for Nonsuit with prejudice against Defendant USF Holland Inc. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/2/09. (jct)
May 18, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Joseph Lewis to bring electronic devices into the Courthouse in Jonesboro between 5/18/2009 & 5/22/2009, subject to the rules specified. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/18/09. (jct)
May 13, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Defendant's Motion to Strike Rita Marshall from Plaintiff's Witness List; denying 53 Defendant's Motion for Sanctions; denying 57 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of expert discovery deadline; denying 72 & 74 Defendant's Motions to Strike Plaintiff's responses. Counsel for Plaintiff is admonished that the Court will not consider unfiled pleadings. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/13/09. (jct)
May 12, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Calen Bedford to bring electronic devices into the Courthouse in Jonesboro between 5/18/09 & 5/22/09, subject to the rules specified. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/12/09. (jct)
May 6, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER authorizing James A. Arnold, II to bring electronic devices into the Courthouse in Jonesboro between 5/18/09 & 5/22/09, subject to the rules specified. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/6/09. (jct)
April 3, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/3/09. (mkf)
March 2, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/2/09. (jct)
February 18, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Joint MOTION to Continue. The discovery deadline is extended to 3/9/09, & the motions deadline is extended to 3/26/09. The trial remains set for 5/18/09. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/18/09. (jct)
September 24, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to appear pro hac vice. John Somyak is hereby admitted to the bar of this Court for the limited purpose of appearing in this case as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/24/07. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Lee Jones
Represented By: John Somyak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USF Holland Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?