Bartels v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Anthony W Bartels
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2007cv00143
Filed: October 9, 2007
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 1156 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay. The stay entered on 11/25/08 20 is hereby lifted. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/29/08. (jct)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JUDGMENT, pursuant to 16 Order entered this date, in favor of Anthony W Bartels against Social Security Administration in the amount of $1,106.00. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/28/08. (jct)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 12 of Magistrate Judge Jerry Cavaneau in their entirety as this Court's findings. Therefore, 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Social Security Administration is hereby denied. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/22/08. (jct)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS withdrawing 11 previous Report And Recommendations; recommending that 6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss be denied. Objections to R&R due by 9/16/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 9/5/08. (jct)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartels v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony W Bartels
Represented By: Eugene Gregory Wallace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?