Harris v. Bilco Company

Plaintiff: Nelson Harris
Defendant: Bilco Company
Case Number: 3:2007cv00156
Filed: October 25, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to settlement. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/5/09. (jct)
April 30, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Defendant's Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/30/09. (jct)
April 29, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Ellen Owens Smith & Khayyam M. Eddings, counsel for defendant, to bring electronic devices into the Courthouse in Jonesboro, Arkansas, between 5/4/09 & 5/6/09, subject to the rules specified. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/29/09. (jct)
April 24, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER directing counsel to report to Courtroom #324 in Jonesboro, Arkansas, by 8:30 a.m. on Monday May 4, 2009 to begin trial of this matter as previously scheduled in 42 Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/24/09. (mkf) Modified on 4/24/2009 to add the word "Amended" to the Order text. (mkf)
February 4, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial. The trial of this case will begin sometime the week of 5/4/09 at the U.S. Courthouse in Jonesboro. All deadlines have passed, so a new scheduling order will not be issued, except the parties are directed to comply with paragraph 8 of the current scheduling order on or before 4/27/09. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/4/09. (jct)
February 3, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 34 Defendant's MOTION in Limine. The deadline is extended up to & including 2/3/09. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/3/09. (jct)
October 3, 2008 27 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 13 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/3/08. (bkp)
September 12, 2008 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Joint MOTION to Continue. The trial of this matter previously set for 9/22/08 is removed from the Court's docket. A new trial date & scheduling deadlines will be set by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/12/08. (jct)
September 8, 2008 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's response deadline to 13 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment is hereby extended up to & including 9/11/08. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/8/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Bilco Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Harris
Represented By: James Edward Patrick, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bilco Company
Represented By: Ellen Owens Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?