Henry v. Premcor Refining Group Inc

Plaintiff: Tim Henry
Defendant: Premcor Refining Group Inc
Case Number: 3:2007cv00158
Filed: October 30, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2011 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice pursuant to settlement. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/28/2011. (jct)
February 15, 2011 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER cancelling the 3/7/11 jury trial & all deadlines based upon the parties' notification to the Court that the case has settled. If the parties have not submitted the appropriate pleading to close the case by 3/7/11, the parties are directed to file an additional status report with the Court. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/15/2011. (jct)
January 27, 2010 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 123 Flash Oil's Motion to Clarify & for Ruling, setting forth the Court's interpretation. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/27/2010. (jct)
January 11, 2010 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 104 Premcor's Motion in Limine as specified herein; granting 120 Flash Oil's Motion to Clarify in that the two questions asked in its Motion are answered herein. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/11/10. (jct)
December 7, 2009 117 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER, after being more fully advised, the Court finds it would be appropriate for Flash Oil's counsel to depose Premcor's counsel. The Court is disinclined to disqualify Premcor's counsel from testifying at the trial because of giving these depositions. The parties can submit briefs on this issue if they desire, with simultaneous briefs to be filed precisely at 11:00 a.m., Monday, December 14, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/7/09. (jct)
September 29, 2009 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 101 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge H. David Young in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Therefore, 80 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Premcor Refining Group Inc is granted; 81 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Flash Oil Company of Arkansas Inc is denied. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/29/09. (jct)
September 4, 2009 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 Motion for Discovery; granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion to Compel, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 9/4/09. (bkp) (Docket entry modified on 9/11/2009 to correct the signer.) (thd).
August 24, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 67 Flash Oil's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/24/09. (jct)
July 29, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 64 Premcor's Motion to Quash Notices of Deposition of Stephen D. Goodwin & Angela R. Meredith. The subpoenas are QUASHED, because the depositions were not noticed in a reasonable time before the deposition. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/29/09. (jct)
April 24, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 55 Third Party Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/24/09. (bkp)
January 13, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 50 Notice of Settlement, all claims in this action as between Tim Henry & Premcor Refining Group Inc are DISMISSED with prejudice. The third-party claim of Premcor Refining Group Inc may continue against Flash Oil Company of Arkansas Inc. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/13/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Premcor Refining Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Henry
Represented By: Phillip J. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premcor Refining Group Inc
Represented By: Angela R. Merideth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?