Granjas Aquanova SA de CV v. House Manufacturing Company Inc et al

Plaintiff: Granjas Aquanova SA de CV
Defendant: House Manufacturing Company Inc and Does
Case Number: 3:2007cv00168
Filed: November 6, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of Country
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2010 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 127 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 132 Motion for Attorney Fees and awarding Aquanova's attorneys' fees in the amount of $423,954.45 and $26,047.44 for costs, and denying Aquanova's motion for prejudgment interest. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/19/10. (bkp)
September 2, 2010 126 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 125 Jury Verdict, in favor of Granjas Aquanova SA de CV against House Manufacturing Company Inc in the amount of $675,000.00, interest accruing daily at a post judgment interest rate of 0.26%. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/2/2010. (jct)
August 24, 2010 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER advising that Angie Hopkins is authorized to bring electronic devices into the U.S. Federal Building in Jonesboro between 8/23/10 & 8/30/10, subject to the stated rules. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/24/2010. (jct)
August 19, 2010 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER advising that Michael J. Emerson, Jonathan Baker, Lisa Creasey, Barry House, Barry Deacon, Eric Gere, Tony Lamacchia, Eduardo Avalos & James Ehinger are authorized to bring electronic devices into the U.S. Federal Building in Jonesboro between 8/23/10 & 8/30/10, subject to the stated rules. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/19/2010. (jct)
June 4, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 73 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ECS House Industries Inc; all claims of plaintiff against it are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/4/2010. (jct)
November 18, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 64 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file its Second Amended Complaint forthwith. (Discovery deadline is extended to 12/11/09; Motions deadline extended to 12/28/09). Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/18/09. (jct)
November 6, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/6/09. (bkp)
June 24, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 44 , 46 & 51 Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/24/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granjas Aquanova SA de CV v. House Manufacturing Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granjas Aquanova SA de CV
Represented By: Barry Deacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: House Manufacturing Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?