Miller v. Bishop

Plaintiff: Ronnie Miller
Defendant: M Bishop
Case Number: 3:2007cv00170
Filed: November 7, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Izard
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2012 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 114 Motion for Reimbursement of out-of-pocket expenses filed by Plaintiff's appointed counsel. The Clerk of the Court is directed to distribute to Wright, Lindsey & Jennings LLLP the amount of $1,489.46. A copy of this Order, together with the application, shall be placed in the Fund file maintained by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/10/2012. (jct)
November 9, 2011 113 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 112 Order on Motion to Dismiss entered this date, this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/9/2011. (jct)
June 7, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 96 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (Discovery due by 7/1/2011). Deposition designations shall be submitted 3 working days following receipt of the transcripts. Counter designations shall be made w/i 5 days thereafter. All other deadlines shall remain in effect. The 7/13/11 Jury Trial shall proceed as set. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/7/2011. (jct)
June 19, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 60 Report and Recommendations and denying 53 Motion to Dismiss filed by Gerald Bishop. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/19/09. (bkp)
June 3, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending the 53 MOTION to Dismiss filed by deft Gerald Bishop be denied; Objections to R&R due by 6/17/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 6/3/09. (tjj)
May 20, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 53 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gerald Bishop, Plaintiff is directed to file a response within 10 days of the date of this Order. Failure to respond shall result in the dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 5/20/09. (jct)
March 9, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr.; DENYING without prejudice 42 Plaintiff's MOTION for review/correction of identity/to appoint counsel. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/9/09. (jct)
November 17, 2008 39 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Gerald Bishop against Ronnie Miller re 38 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/17/08. (bkp)
October 31, 2008 36 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending pltf's complaint be dismissed without prejudice and attorney Clyde Hance be relieved as appointed counsel 2 ; Objections to R&R due by 11/14/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 10/31/08. (tjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?