Nelson Design Group LLC v. Puckett et al

Defendant: State Development LLC, Brent Phillips, Richard Puckett, Barry Phillips and Phillips Investments & Construction Inc
Plaintiff: Nelson Design Group LLC
Case Number: 3:2007cv00177
Filed: November 21, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2008 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Phillips Investments & Construction Inc, & dismissing with prejudice plaintifff's claims against Phillips Investments & Construction Inc. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/12/08. (jct)
June 25, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Gerald A. Coleman, Hunter J. Hanshaw, Janetta (Jan) R. Roberts, Karolina Majewski & Richard Puckett to bring a cell phone, laptop computer or personal digital assistant into the U.S. Federal Building & Courthouse in Jonesboro between 6/29/09 & 7/2/09, subject to the stated provisions. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/25/09. (jct)
July 28, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, after a bench trial, finding that Richard Puckett, Barry Phillips, Brent Phillips & State Development LLC infringed upon Nelson Design Group LLC's copyrights numbered NDG128R, NDG220, NDG508, NDG510 & NDG905. State Development LLC, upon whose behalf Barry Phillips & Brent Phillips purchased the designs, is ordered to pay damages to Nelson Design in the amount of $4,250.00. The record is clear that Puckett intentionally copied Nelson Design's copyrighted designs. Richard Puckett is hereby ordered to pay damages to Nelson Design in the amount of $8,500.00. All defendants are hereby enjoined from ever using the designs at issue in this lawsuit & from engaging in any future activity that infringes, in any way, upo n the copyrighted designs of Nelson Design. Puckett & State Development are hereby ordered to pay the reasonable attorney's fees incurred by Nelson Design in the enforcement of the five designs that Puckett & State Development infringed. Pucke tt & State Development are jointly & severally liable for said fees, which are to be determined by the Court. Nelson Design is to prepare a verified fee petition & submit it within 30 days of this Order. Central States Development Inc did not receive services from Puckett & therefore all claims against it are dismissed. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/28/09. (jct)
July 30, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 80 Order, directing Defendant Richard Puckett to pay damages in the amount of $8,500 to Plaintiff Nelson Design Group LLC, & Defendant State Development LLC is ordered to pay damages in the amount of $4,250 to Plaint iff Nelson Design Group LLC. Puckett & State Development are ordered to pay the reasonable attorney's fees & costs incurred by Nelson Design in prosecuting its claims against Puckett & State Development. Puckett & State Development are jointly & severally liable for these fees & costs, which will be determined by the Court once Nelson Design has submitted its verified fee petition. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/30/09. (jct)
October 8, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as stated 82 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees & Costs. The Court awards Plaintiff Nelson Design Group LLC $25,690 in attorney's fees & $1,505.91 in costs. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/8/09. (jct)
April 20, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Nelson Design Group LLC & State Development LLC. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/20/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson Design Group LLC v. Puckett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips Investments & Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Design Group LLC
Represented By: Gerald A. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.