Burkhart v. American Railcar Industries Inc

Plaintiff: Cathy Burkhart
Defendant: American Railcar Industries Inc
Case Number: 3:2007cv00199
Filed: December 26, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (in related case 3:09-cv-00081) entered pursuant to 39 Memorandum. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/30/2009. (thd)
April 28, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 33 Memorandum And Order entered this date, granting Defendant American Railcar Industries, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment as to Plaintiff Cathy Burkhart's Title VII hostile environment and retaliation claims. Plaintiff Burkhart's state law Arkansas Civil Rights Act and tort of outrage claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/28/09. (jct) Docket text modified on 1/27/2010 to correct typographical error (lmr).
April 8, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing 4/20/09 trial. The Court will issue an amended scheduling order setting a new trial date, if necessary, following a ruling on defendant's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/8/2009. (jct)
February 2, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending the time for Defendant to respond to 10 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel to & including 2/13/09. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/2/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burkhart v. American Railcar Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Burkhart
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Railcar Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?