Ray v. Cole et al

Plaintiff: David Michael Ray
Defendant: Ronnie Cole, Joe Martin, Phil Faulkner, Chuck Boon, Chris Crawford and Montie Sanders
Case Number: 3:2008cv00002
Filed: January 7, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Clay
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2009 73 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 72 Order entered this date, Plaintiff's complaint is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/13/09. (jct)
December 2, 2008 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 & 57 Defendants' MOTIONS to Extend Time to file Motions for Summary Judgment. Defendants shall file their motions by 12/5/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 12/2/08. (jct)
September 11, 2008 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 47 of U. S. Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr. in all respects in their entirety. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 43 Plaintiff's MOTION for preliminary injunctive relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/11/08. (jct)
February 5, 2008 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an updated request to proceed in forma pauperis within 15 days of date of this Order. Failure to file such shall result in the dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/5/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray v. Cole et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Michael Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Boon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montie Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?