Wheeler v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC

Plaintiff: Mildred Wheeler
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Case Number: 3:2008cv00016
Filed: February 5, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to settlement. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/15/09. (jct)
May 12, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the parties request for an additional 30 days to continue settlement discussions. The parties are directed to submit a revised status report to the Court by 6/12/09. If no settlement is attained by that date, this matter will be placed back on the Court's trial docket. (Status Report due by 6/12/2009) Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/12/09. (jct)
April 28, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to submit a report to the Court by 5/12/09 indicating the status of the case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/28/09. (jct)
November 19, 2008 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 defendant's MOTION to Extend Deadlines & continue trial date. The trial of this matter previously set for 2/9/09 is removed from the Court's docket. A new trial date & scheduling deadlines will be set by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/19/08. (jct)
October 28, 2008 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Joel G. Hargis and Debra J. Reece for Plaintiff Mildred Wheeler, ordering Plaintiff to respond to the motion on or before 11/28/08. If Plaintiff does not oppose the motion, she must either give not ice that she intends to proceed pro se & include in that notice an address & telephone number whereby the Court & opposing counsel may communicate with her concerning this case; or she must have a new lawyer enter an appearance by 11/28/08. If Wheeler does not comply with this order, the Court will dismiss her case without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/28/08. (jct)
February 5, 2008 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Greene County Circuit Judge. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Wheeler
Represented By: Debra J. Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Patrick L. Lowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?