Jefferson v. Securitas USA

Plaintiff: Velma Jefferson
Defendant: Securitas USA
Case Number: 3:2008cv00024
Filed: February 12, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Bill of Costs filed by Securitas Security Services USA Inc. to the extent that the Court allows defendant costs in the amount of $302.90. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/12/09. (jct)
January 16, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 57 Memorandum Opinion & Order entered this date, the Court hereby dismissses Plaintiff's complaint. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/16/09. (jct)
December 29, 2008 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 39 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss & 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment, upon verbal motion, Defendant has until & including 1/7/09, in which to file a reply to Plaintiff's responses to said motions. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/29/08. (jct)
December 18, 2008 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 defendant's MOTION to Stay proceedings pending a ruling on defendant's motion for summary judgment, & the 1/12/09 trial date & all pending deadlines are hereby stayed. A separate order rescheduling a trial date & deadlines will be entered, if necessary, in the case before this Court. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/18/08. (jct)
December 3, 2008 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 39 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Discovery Sanctions & 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment, directing Plaintiff to respond to said motions within 10 days from the date of receipt of this Order. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of Plaintiff's complaint. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of this Order by both regular & certified mail return receipt requested. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/3/08. (jct)
September 9, 2008 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 defendant's Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is directed to respond to the discovery requests within 15 days from the date of entry of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of plaintiff's complaint pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 37(b)(2)(A)(v). Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/9/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jefferson v. Securitas USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velma Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securitas USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?