Sitzes et al v. West Memphis Arkansas, City of et al

Plaintiff: Brant Sitzes and Nancy Sitzes
Defendant: West Memphis Arkansas, City of, William H Johnson, Robert Paudert, James A Wright, Arkansas Municipal League and West Memphis City Council
Case Number: 3:2008cv00026
Filed: February 15, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER, re 17 & 20 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment, directing Atty Charton & Atty Wren to advise, by 5:00 p.m. on 4/13/09, if they agree that the Arkansas "savings statute" will reserve & preserve all of Plaintiffs' state law claims for the time period prescribed in that statute. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/8/2009. (jct)
March 24, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's motion regarding Interrogatory No. 2 is DENIED in that the interrogatory is too broad. If there are any formal complaints filed against Defendants w/i the past 5 ye ars that have not been distributed to Plaintiffs, then such complaints must be supplied by Defendants by 5:00 p.m. on 4/6/09, or, in the alternative, Defendants must answer the interrogatory with respect to these designated complaints. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/24/09. (jct)
March 18, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER, re 15 Plaintiffs' First MOTION to Compel or other relief, advising Defendants if they choose not to respond by 5:00 p.m. on 3/20/09, the motion will be granted. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/18/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sitzes et al v. West Memphis Arkansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brant Sitzes
Represented By: Marc I. Baretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Sitzes
Represented By: Marc I. Baretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Memphis Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Paudert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Municipal League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Memphis City Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?